VA HB1243 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1243

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995; Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002; affected local jurisdictions and public entities; consideration of economic impact. Requires a private entity requesting approval to develop and operate a qualifying transportation facility under the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995 or a qualifying project under the Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002 to include an economic impact analysis identifying any potentially adverse economic or revenue impacts a potential comprehensive agreement may have on all affected local jurisdictions. The bill further provides that affected local jurisdictions be given reasonable opportunity to consult with the parties concerning the nature and scope of the impacts and regarding measures that may be taken to avoid or mitigate the impacts or make the agreement revenue-neutral. The bill directs each responsible public entity to certify compliance with the review of the economic impact analysis provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995; affected local jurisdictions and public entities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Transportation
2020-02-04HouseContinued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105276D

Same As/Similar To

HB1243 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3321803(n/a)See Bill Text
3321805(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback