VA HB1224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management; proprietary best management practices; emergency. Directs the State Water Control Board to update its regulations providing for the certification and use of a proprietary best management practice (BMP) if another state, regional, or national program has verified its nutrient or sediment removal effectiveness and its having met or exceeded all of such program's established test protocol requirements. Currently, the BMP may only be used if another state, regional, or national certification program has verified and certified its nutrient or sediment removal effectiveness. The bill also directs the Department of Environmental Quality to prioritize review of any proprietary BMP that was on the Virginia Stormwater BMP Clearinghouse prior to December 31, 2021, and that submits documentation of verification of effectiveness by another state, regional, or national program. The bill contains an emergency clause. Stormwater management; proprietary best management practices; emergency. Directs the State Water Control Board to update its regulations providing for the certification and use of a proprietary best management practice (BMP) if another state, regional, or national program has verified its nutrient or sediment removal effectiveness and its having met or exceeded all of such program's established test protocol requirements. Currently, the BMP may only be used if another state, regional, or national certification program has verified and certified its nutrient or sediment removal effectiveness. The bill also directs the Department of Environmental Quality to prioritize review of any proprietary BMP that was on the Virginia Stormwater BMP Clearinghouse prior to December 31, 2021, and that submits documentation of verification of effectiveness by another state, regional, or national program. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Stormwater management; proprietary best management practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 32 (effective 4/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1224ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | Emergency clause added |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1224H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105648D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105648D-H1 |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104434D |