VA HB1210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Minority language accessibility; voting and election materials. Requires the State Board of Elections to prescribe, and a covered locality to provide, voting and election materials in languages other than English. A county, city, or town is designated by the State Board as a covered locality if the State Board determines, in consultation with the Director of the Census, based on the 2010 American Community Survey census data and subsequent American Community Survey data in five-year increments, or comparable census data, that (i) either (a) more than five percent of the citizens of voting age of such county, city, or town are members of a single language minority and are unable to speak or understand English adequately enough to participate in the electoral process; (b) more than 10,000 of the citizens of voting age of such county, city, or town are members of a single language minority and are unable to speak or understand English adequately enough to participate in the electoral process; or (c) in the case of a county, city, or town containing all or any part of an Indian reservation, more than five percent of the American Indian citizens of voting age within the Indian reservation are members of a single language minority and are unable to speak or understand English adequately enough to participate in the electoral process and (ii) the illiteracy rate of the citizens of the language minority as a group is higher than the national illiteracy rate. The bill also allows the State Board to make available voting and election materials in any additional languages other than those required as it deems necessary and appropriate. The State Board may accept voting and election materials translated by volunteers but shall verify the accuracy of such translations prior to making the translated materials available to a county, city, or town, or any voter. The bill has a delayed effective date of September 1, 2021.
Title
Minority language accessibility; voting and election materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 13-N) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 13-N) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 719 (effective 9/1/21) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1210ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 38-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (60-Y 38-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103702D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1210E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103702D |