VA HB1207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; training; powers and duties of guardian; annual reports by guardians; information required. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to develop and provide training for court-appointed guardians. The bill requires an appointed guardian and any staff employed by such guardian to perform guardianship duties to complete the initial training developed by the Department within four months of the date of the initial court order of appointment and to include certain additional information in the annual report that the guardian is required under current law to submit to the local department of social services.
Title
DARS; training, powers, and duties of guardian.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 22104894D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104547D |
Subjects
Aging and Rehabilitative Services Department for
Persons with Disabilities
Wills Trusts and Fiduciaries
Persons with Disabilities
Wills Trusts and Fiduciaries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 5 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |