VA HB1207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; investigative and enforcement proceedings; information provided to individuals or business entities who are the subject of a complaint involving abuse or neglect. Provides that persons who are the subject of a complaint involving abuse or neglect have a right to be provided with (i) unredacted copies of notes and reports relating to the investigation and the names of the reporter and collateral witnesses and (ii) all other information that the Department of Social Services (Department) or local department intends to rely upon, in whole or in part, in reaching a determination regarding the complaint. The Department or local department may withhold from disclosure (a) the reporter's name, (b) the identity of a collateral witness, (c) the identity of any other person providing information, or (d) any other information connected to the investigation only upon a specific determination that such disclosure would endanger the well-being of a child or the life or safety of the reporter or collateral witness. The bill provides that the decision to withhold the name, identity, or other information may be appealed to the circuit court with the local department having the burden of proving by clear and convincing evidence that the disclosure would endanger the well-being of a child or the life or safety of the reporter or collateral witness or any other person providing information.
Title
Investigative and enforcement proceedings; information provided to individuals or business entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104286D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1729 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |