VA HB120 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Beach Sports or Entertainment Project; extend expiration date of tax incentive; modify financing structure. Provides that the City of Virginia Beach's entitlement to state sales and use tax revenue attributable to a sports or entertainment project, which under current law will expire on July 1, 2039, shall expire on July 1 following the twentieth anniversary of the completion of construction of the sports and entertainment project. The bill authorizes the City of Virginia Beach to work with a community development authority established by the City to develop a sports or entertainment district, and authorizes it to use funds from the Sports or Entertainment Project Financing Fund to pay for debt maintenance costs of such authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Beach Sports or Entertainment Project; extends expiration date of tax incentive, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE:DEFEATED (44-Y 51-N) (Y: 44 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
2020-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB120ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A)
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N)
2020-02-10HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-10HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
2020-02-10HouseVOTE:DEFEATED (44-Y 51-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and defeated by House (44-Y 51-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB120H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20105677D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105677D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
2020-01-29HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-12-16HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101271D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1525113(n/a)See Bill Text
1525931(n/a)See Bill Text
1525932(n/a)See Bill Text
1525933(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB120&201+sum+HB120
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB120+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB120H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB120ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0467+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1002V0025+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0073+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0175+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0224+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0736+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0899+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0432+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0120+HB0120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1058HB0120+HB0120

Bill Comments

feedback