VA HB1173 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Tax exemption for certified pollution control equipment and facilities; timing of certification by the state certifying authority. Provides that, upon the request of a political subdivision, the state certifying authority having jurisdiction shall certify the tax-exempt status of certain pollution control equipment and facilities on a prospective basis. The property eligible for such treatment shall be equipment and facilities intended for use by a political subdivision in conjunction with the operation of its water, wastewater, stormwater, or solid waste management facilities or systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified pollution control equipment and facilities; tax exemption, timing of certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 6-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseReported from Finance (20-Y 1-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103437D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback