VA SB685 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax exemption for certified pollution control equipment and facilities; timing of certification by the state certifying authority. Provides that, upon the request of a political subdivision, the state certifying authority having jurisdiction shall certify the tax-exempt status of certain pollution control equipment and facilities on a prospective basis. The property eligible for such treatment shall be equipment and facilities intended for use by a political subdivision in conjunction with the operation of its water, wastewater, stormwater, or solid waste management facilities or systems.
Title
Certified pollution control equipment and facilities; tax exemption, timing of certification.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 65 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB685ER) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104955D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1173 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)