VA HB1173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management programs; optional for some localities. Requires the Department of Environmental Quality to establish a Virginia Stormwater Management Program (VSMP) for any locality that neither opts to establish its own program nor operates a municipal separate storm sewer system (MS4). The bill defers the VSMP requirement for six months for certain recent MS4 localities. The bill alters the permitting appeals process and allows for an agreement in lieu of a stormwater management plan, and it directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations relating to the issuance of permits for parcels in subdivisions, the registration of single-family residences, and the reciprocity given by Virginia for proprietary Best Management Practices established elsewhere. The bill exempts single-family residences from payment of the Department's portion of the fee for the state general permit. Finally, the bill provides that the consolidation of state post-construction requirements into Virginia's General Permit shall not modify the scope of enforcement of the federal Clean Water Act and exempts from most requirements of the Administrative Process Act those regulations of the State Water Control Board that will be necessary to implement the act.
Title
Stormwater management programs; State Water Control Board to establish procedures and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 598 (effective 4/4/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1173ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105165D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1173S1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105165D-S1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105165D-S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1173H2 |
2014-02-04 | House | Emergency clause added |
2014-02-04 | House | Substitute by Delegate Hodges agreed to 14104771D-H2 |
2014-02-04 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104771D-H2 (Hodges) |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute rejected 14104376D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB261 |
2014-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB649 |
2014-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB58 |
2014-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104376D-H1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103701D |
Same As/Similar To
HB58 (Similar To) 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
HB649 (Similar To) 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
HB261 (Similar To) 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
SB423 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
HB649 (Similar To) 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
HB261 (Similar To) 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
SB423 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Conservation
Emergency Legislation
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Conservation
Emergency Legislation
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors