VA HB58 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management programs; appeals. Clarifies the appeals process for persons subject to state permit requirements under the Stormwater Management Act. The bill removes Virginia Stormwater Management Program (VSMP) authorities from the list of bodies whose actions may be appealed. For appeals of actions of the Department of Environmental Quality or the State Water Control Board, the bill refers to applicable hearing procedures and provides that appeals include an opportunity with judicial review in accordance with certain standards.
Title
Stormwater management programs; clarifies appeals process for persons subject to permit requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Incorporated by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1173-Hodges) by voice vote |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101064D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:44 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB58 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB58+hil |