VA HB1170 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; aid and cooperation of Division of Purchases and Supply may be sought by any fire company and volunteer emergency medical services agency. Removes the condition that fire companies and volunteer emergency medical services agencies seeking aid and cooperation from the Division of Purchases and Supply (the Division) in making purchases seek such aid and cooperation through and with the approval of a governing body of a county, city, or town. The bill limits purchases of motor fuel through the Division to purchases for the use of operating and propelling equipment used actually and necessarily for firefighting and emergency medical services purposes.
Title
DGS; aid & cooperation of Division of Purchase and Supply to any fire company, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 275 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1170ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1170H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105211D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105211D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103247D |