VA HB1161 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0856)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0856)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jailer-issued identification for prisoners. Allows sheriffs, jail superintendents and jail administrators to issue a special identification card to prisoners who do not possess valid ID at release. All costs shall be paid by the prisoner.
Title
Jailer issued identification; allows sheriffs to issue special identification card to prisoners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0856) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 856 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1161ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1161ER) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103898D |