VA HB1160 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Physical evidence recovery kits. Establishes a comprehensive procedure for the collection and analysis of physical evidence recovery kits for victims of sexual assault, including those who elect at the time of the exam not to report a sexual assault to a law-enforcement agency. Kits from victims who elect not to report are known as "anonymous physical evidence recovery kits" and will be stored at the Division of Consolidated Laboratory Services (the Division) for two years, although the Division, the victim, or the law-enforcement agency may elect for the kits to be retained for a longer period of time. If the victim later elects to report the sexual assault, the victim's kit will be released to law enforcement. Health care providers are required to explain these procedures and time frames to victims. Where the victim elects to report the offense to law enforcement at the time of the exam, law enforcement is required to take possession of the victim's kit forthwith upon notification from the health care provider that the kit has been collected and, with limited exceptions, to submit the kit to the Department of Forensic Science for analysis within 60 days. The bill outlines the exceptions to mandatory submission for analysis, time frames, and storage requirements for retention of analyzed samples; expungement of DNA samples obtained but not connected to a crime; and victims' notification rights.
Title
Physical evidence recovery kits.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698) | |
2016-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1160ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1160H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105473D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Incorporates HB1158 |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105473D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104138D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1158 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB291 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
SB291 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)