VA HB1157 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1157

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; members of governing boards; student voting member. Provides that one member appointed by the Governor to the governing boards of public institutions of higher education shall be a current student voting member. The student voting member shall have been elected by his peers to a leadership position in a student organization recognized by the institution or currently serve in an elected position in a student organization recognized by the institution in the year that the Governor appoints such student to a governing board in order to serve on the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; members of governing boards, student voting member.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Education
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 with substitute in Education by voice vote
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20106075D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 with substitute by voice vote
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102096D

Same As/Similar To

HB1157 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Education by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311300(n/a)See Bill Text
2311401(n/a)See Bill Text
2311501(n/a)See Bill Text
2311601(n/a)See Bill Text
2311701(n/a)See Bill Text
2311801(n/a)See Bill Text
2311901(n/a)See Bill Text
2312001(n/a)See Bill Text
2312101(n/a)See Bill Text
2312201(n/a)See Bill Text
2312303(n/a)See Bill Text
2312501(n/a)See Bill Text
2312601(n/a)See Bill Text
2312701(n/a)See Bill Text
2312801(n/a)See Bill Text
2312902(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback