VA HB1146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; land use valuation. Reduces from 20 to 15 acres the minimum number of acres for real property to qualify as devoted solely to forest use for the purpose of land use valuation for the special assessment for land preservation.
Title
Real property tax; land use valuation.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101917D |