VA HB1141 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Summary
Foster care; independent living services. Provides that any person who was committed or entrusted to a local board or licensed child-placing agency may choose to discontinue receiving independent living services any time before his 21st birthday in accordance with regulations adopted by the Board. The local board or licensed child-placing agency shall restore independent living services at the request of that person provided that (i) the person has not yet reached 21 years of age and (ii) the person has entered into a written agreement, less than 60 days after independent living services have been discontinued, with the local board or licensed child-placing agency regarding the terms and conditions of his receipt of independent living services. This bill incorporates
Title
Foster care; independent living services.
Sponsors
Del. Kristen Amundson [D] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. William Fralin [R] | Del. David Toscano [D] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 187 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1141ER) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-05 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1141H1 | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 088573504-H1 | |
2008-02-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 088573504-H1 | |
2008-01-31 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088067504 |
Same As/Similar To
HB813 (Similar To) 2008-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB1141-Fralin) by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1141 |