VA HB1128 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Spouse's liability for medical care; exemption for principal residence. Provides that a lien arising out of a judgment for a spouse's emergency medical care shall not be enforced against the judgment debtor's principal residence held as tenants by the entireties unless the residence is refinanced or transferred to new owners.
Title
Spouse's liability for medical care; exemption for principal residence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 240 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1128ER) |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1128H1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104431D-H1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104431D-H1 |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101964D |