VA HB1126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Committee on District Courts; membership. Reduces from two to one the number of senators appointed to the Committee on District Courts (the Committee) and provides for the Speaker of the House of Delegates to appoint the two delegates on the Committee and for the Senate Committee on Rules to appoint the sole senator on the Committee. Currently, the Chairman of the House Committee for Courts of Justice and the Chairman of the Senate Committee for Courts of Justice appoint two delegates and two senators, respectively, to the Committee.
Title
District Courts, Committee on; increases membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102318D-E |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1126E |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102318D |