VA HB1121 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Massage therapists; qualifications; license. Provides that an applicant who completed a massage therapy educational program in a foreign country may apply for licensure as a massage therapist upon submission of evidence that the applicant (i) is at least 18 years old, (ii) has successfully completed a massage therapy educational program that is comparable to a massage therapy educational program required for licensure by the Board, (iii) has passed a Board-approved English language proficiency examination, and (iv) has not committed any acts or omissions that would be grounds for disciplinary action or denial of licensure. The Board of Nursing shall issue a license to an applicant who completed his massage therapy educational program in a foreign country upon submission of evidence of completion of the English-language version of the Licensing Examination of the Federation of State Massage Therapy Boards or a comparable examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage therapists; qualifications, license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1121ER)
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-25SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-25SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateChair votes N0
2020-02-25SenateDefeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
2020-02-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1121H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106435D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106435D-H1
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101580D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413029(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1121
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1121+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1121H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1121ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0727+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1202V0018+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0048+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0802V0077+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0173+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0666+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0311+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB1121+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0974HB1121+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0975HB1121+HB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1037HB1121+HB1121

Bill Comments 750

feedback