VA HB1105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Affordable housing; City of Charlottesville. Adds the City of Charlottesville to the list of localities with authority to provide for an affordable housing dwelling unit program.
Title
Affordable housing; adds City of Charlottesville to list of localities with authority to provide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 486 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1105ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (81-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101706D |