VA HB1100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management facilities; liability. Provides that a common interest community shall enjoy limited liability protection relating to a stormwater management facility located on property owned by that community if: (i) the common interest community cedes the responsibility for the maintenance, repair, and replacement of a stormwater management facility to the Commonwealth or a political subdivision thereof, (ii) the action has been memorialized by contract or other instrument executed by both parties, and (iii) the Commonwealth or the governing body of the political subdivision accepted the responsibility ceded by the common interest community in writing or by resolution. Maintenance, repair, and replacement responsibilities may include the cleaning of the facility, maintenance of adjacent grounds which are part of the facility, maintenance and replacement of fencing where the facility is fenced, and posting of signage indicating the identity of the governmental entity which maintains the facility. The immunity granted by this provision does not extend to actions or omissions by the landowner constituting intentional or willful misconduct or gross negligence.
Title
Stormwater management; common interest community, etc., shall be immune from civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (73-Y 20-N) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (73-Y 20-N) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1100ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (73-Y 20-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (73-Y 20-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1100ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 19-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (80-Y 19-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 5-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Obenshain agreed to | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1100H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2010-02-12 | House: Motion to refer to Courts committee rejected | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104487D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104487D-H1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #2 Natural Resources | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103554D |