VA HB1096 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Injuries to churches or church property; dead animals. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to maliciously place a dead animal within any church or on church property.
Title
Dead animals; makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to place within or on any church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1096ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108769D-S1 (93-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1096S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108769D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108769D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103067D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1096E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103067D |