VA HB1095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; six-year plans; pricing structure and tuition discounting strategies. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to include in each six-year plan for the institution a detailed explanation of the institution's pricing structure and tuition discounting strategies, including pricing by student income level and the use of tuition revenue for financial aid.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; six-year plans, pricing structure and tuition discounting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102559D |