VA HB1093 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prisoners; obtaining certain identification documentation upon release. Requires the Department of Corrections and the sheriff, jail superintendent, or other jail administrator of a local correctional facility to provide the assistance necessary for any prisoner who does not already possess a government-issued identification card to apply for and obtain such identification. The requirement would apply for any prisoner who has been confined for a period of 90 days or more. If a prisoner is unable to obtain a government-issued identification, the Department would provide a Department of Corrections Offender Identification form. The bill further requires all costs and fees associated with obtaining such identification documentation to be paid by the prisoner unless the prisoner is determined to be indigent. Current law authorizes local correctional institutions to issue special identification cards prior to the release of any prisoner and requires the prisoner to pay all costs and fees associated with obtaining such card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners; obtaining certain identification documentation upon release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
2020-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1093ER)
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled
2020-03-03HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20109357D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (35-Y 3-N 1-A)
2020-03-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1093S1
2020-03-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Favola agreed to 20109357D-S1
2020-03-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-02SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenateFloor substitute printed 20109357D-S1 (Favola)
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-14SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 20102519D-E
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1093E
2020-02-05HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102519D

Same As/Similar To

HB1467 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531116.1:02(n/a)See Bill Text
53131.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1093&201+sum+HB1093
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1093+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1093E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1093S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1093ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0484+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1502V0021+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0031+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0538+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0117+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0481+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB1093+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1373HB1093+HB1093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1742+HB1093

Bill Comments

feedback