VA HB1064 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1064
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Education, for the purpose of providing grants on a competitive basis to any school board that seeks to (i) establish, expand, or restore high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials or (ii) establish, expand, or restore middle school programs that encourage and recruit students to participate in high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials. Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; established. Establishes the Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program, to be administered by the Department of Education, for the purpose of providing grants on a competitive basis to any school board that seeks to (i) establish, expand, or restore high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials or (ii) establish, expand, or restore middle school programs that encourage and recruit students to participate in high school programs that teach students skilled trades that lead to earning industry-recognized certifications or credentials.
Title
Public School Trades Incentive Fund and Program; created and established, rules and procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102053D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1064E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102053D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1064 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N 1-A)