VA HB1060 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elected school boards; staggered elections. Provides that any locality in Planning District 8 may establish a system of staggered elections for the school board regardless of whether the terms of the local governing body are staggered.
Title
School boards; any locality in Planning District 8 may establish system of staggered elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102951D |