VA HB1056 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; cancer presumption; service requirement. Reduces from five to three the years of service required for firefighters and certain other employees to qualify for the cancer presumption of an occupational disease for the purposes of workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation; cancer presumption, service requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101784D |