VA HB105 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Summary
Appointment of designees by chairmen of Courts of Justice Committees. Allows the chairmen of the Courts of Justice committees to designate another member of the committee to sit in their stead on certain commissions, etc.
Title
Courts of Justice Committees; appointment of designees by chairmen.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB105ER) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-25 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2007-12-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-17 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084541404 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB105 |