VA HB1042 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expiration of driver's licenses; active duty military. Extends the grace period for driver's license expiration from 90 to 180 days after the return from service outside the United States of active duty military personnel, a member of the diplomatic service, or a civilian employee of the U.S. government or a federal agency or contractor.
Title
Driver's licenses; extends expiration date for certain active military personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384) | |
2012-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1042ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101222D |