VA HB1040 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of photo-monitoring systems to enforce traffic light signals; appeals. Provides that operators found in violation of ordinances created to enforce photo-monitoring systems for traffic lights have a right to appeal to the circuit court in a civil proceeding. The bill also reduces from $50 to $20 the amount of the matter in controversy above which an appeal of right exists in a civil case.
Title
Traffic light signal photo-monitoring; use of system, appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (25-Y 13-N) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (25-Y 13-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (78-Y 19-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | Governor's veto overridden (78-Y 19-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1040ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102891D-E |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1040E |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102891D |