VA HB1026 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Superintendent of Public Instruction; establishment of the Digital Citizenship, Internet Safety, and Media Literacy Advisory Council. Requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish and appoint no more than 12 members to the Digital Citizenship, Internet Safety, and Media Literacy Advisory Council (the Council), including at least one of each of the following: teacher, librarian, representative of a parent-teacher organization who is the parent of a school-age child, school administrator, student, and individual with expertise in digital citizenship, Internet safety, and media literacy. The bill requires the Council to (i) develop and recommend to the Board of Education for adoption a model policy for local school boards that would enable such school boards to better support the digital citizenship, Internet safety, and media literacy of all students and teachers in the local school division; (ii) develop and recommend to the Board for adoption model instructional practices for the safe, ethical, and responsible use of media and technology by students and teachers in public elementary and secondary schools; (iii) design and post on the Department of Education's website a page with links to successful instructional practices, curricula, and other teacher resources used in school divisions within and outside of the Commonwealth for the safe, ethical, and responsible use of media and technology by students and teachers; and (iv) submit a report of its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than October 31, 2023. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2024. Superintendent of Public Instruction; establishment of the Digital Citizenship, Internet Safety, and Media Literacy Advisory Council. Requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish and appoint no more than 12 members to the Digital Citizenship, Internet Safety, and Media Literacy Advisory Council (the Council), including at least one of each of the following: teacher, librarian, representative of a parent-teacher organization who is the parent of a school-age child, school administrator, student, and individual with expertise in digital citizenship, Internet safety, and media literacy. The bill requires the Council to (i) develop and recommend to the Board of Education for adoption a model policy for local school boards that would enable such school boards to better support the digital citizenship, Internet safety, and media literacy of all students and teachers in the local school division; (ii) develop and recommend to the Board for adoption model instructional practices for the safe, ethical, and responsible use of media and technology by students and teachers in public elementary and secondary schools; (iii) design and post on the Department of Education's website a page with links to successful instructional practices, curricula, and other teacher resources used in school divisions within and outside of the Commonwealth for the safe, ethical, and responsible use of media and technology by students and teachers; and (iv) submit a report of its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than October 31, 2023. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2024.
Title
Internet Safety Advisory Council; established, sunset date, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1026ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 41-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (59-Y 41-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 22108163D-H1 |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1026ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (54-Y 44-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 39-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed House (60-Y 39-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103266D |