VA HB1021 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; waiver usage flexibility for local community services boards. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services (DMAS) and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to amend their regulations to allow local community services boards the discretion to convert allocated Community Living waivers to Family and Individual Support waivers and Building Independence waivers if the Community Living waivers are not being utilized and will not be utilized in the foreseeable future. The bill requires DMAS to seek any necessary federal approvals to effectuate this modification through the submission of a state plan for medical assistance services amendment to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services.
Title
Community services boards, local; waiver usage flexibility.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107172D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102733D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Medical Treatment Care and Assistance
Uncodified Legislation
Medical Treatment Care and Assistance
Uncodified Legislation