VA HB1009 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited public carrying of certain firearms; penalty. Adds the City of Charlottesville and the County of Albemarle to the list of localities in which it is prohibited to carry certain loaded firearms with high-capacity magazines, silencers, folding stock, or long ammunition or a loaded shotgun with a magazine that will hold more than seven rounds of the longest ammunition for which it is chambered.
Title
Firearms, certain; prohibited public carrying, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100632D |