VA HB1006 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human trafficking assessments by local departments. Changes the name of sex trafficking assessments to human trafficking assessments and allows local departments of social services conducting such human trafficking assessments to interview the alleged child victim or his siblings without the consent and outside the presence of such child's or siblings' parent, guardian, legal custodian, or other person standing in loco parentis, or school personnel. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Human trafficking; assessments by local departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 24, 2020 | |
2020-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 17, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1006ER) |
2020-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105035D |
Same As/Similar To
SB706 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)