VA HB1 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on November 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Motor vehicles; definitions. Redefines the term "disabled veteran" for the purposes of Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles) to include a veteran who is at least 50% disabled as certified by the U.S. Veterans Administration. This definition governs which veterans are eligible for disabled veteran special license plates. This bill incorporates
Title
Disabled veteran; definition thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation (May) | |
2008-01-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 083516676-H1 | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-22 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 3 | |
2007-11-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2007-11-19 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084443676 |
Same As/Similar To
HB17 (Similar To) 2010-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1 |