UT SR0001 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Rules Resolution -- Amendments to Senate Rules
Title
Senate Rules Resolution -- Amendments to Senate Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-05 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |