UT SJR008 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ronald Reagan Day Joint Resolution
Title
Ronald Reagan Day Joint Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-02-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-07 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-07 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-02-07 | House/ lifted from standing committee in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-02-02 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |