UT SJR007 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Designating Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day and Month
Title
Joint Resolution Designating Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day and Month
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Knudson [R] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-27 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-26 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2018-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-12 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |