UT SJR003 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Ethics Complaint Procedures
Title
Joint Resolution on Ethics Complaint Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in SSUB | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2010-01-29 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTGOP | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SINTRO | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SINTRO | |
2010-01-21 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SINTRO | |
2009-12-29 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-23 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SJR003.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sjr003.pdf |