UT SJR002 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Prohibition on Real Estate Transfer Tax
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Prohibition on Real Estate Transfer Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-12-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-12-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions, Rules
Revenue and Taxation
Utah Constitutional Amendments
Property Tax
Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions, Rules
Revenue and Taxation
Utah Constitutional Amendments