UT SJR001S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SJR001
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR001S02
Note: Legislation replaced by SJR001S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Museum Recognizing Atrocities Against American Indians
Title
Joint Resolution on Museum Recognizing Atrocities Against American Indians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSPEC |
2014-02-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSPEC |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in SSPEC |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S3RD |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSPEC |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in SSPEC |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S3RD |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to calendar in S2ND |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in SINTRO |
2013-12-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SJR001 (Replaces) 2014-02-10 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
SJR001S02 (Replaced by) 2014-02-28 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
SJR001S02 (Replaced by) 2014-02-28 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV