UT SCR011 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Expressing Opposition to the Creation of New National Monuments in Utah
Title
Concurrent Resolution Expressing Opposition to the Creation of New National Monuments in Utah
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |