UT SB6003 | 2020 | 6th Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Tuition Reimbursement
Title
Law Enforcement Tuition Reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] | Rep. Lee Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-08-26 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-08-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-08-21 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-08-21 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-08-20 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-08-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-08-20 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-08-20 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-08-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-08-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-08-20 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-08-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-08-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-08-20 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-08-20 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-08-20 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-08-19 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-08-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-08-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |