UT SB0292 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Airport Operator Lease Agreements
Title
Airport Operator Lease Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Madsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 1 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 1 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-03-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2012-03-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ motion to reconsider passed in SSEC | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ motion to reconsider in SSEC | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ failed in SSEC | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-03-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-03-05 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-03-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |