UT SB0277S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0277
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Green River Energy Zone
Title
Green River Energy Zone
Sponsors
Sen. David Hinkins [R] | Rep. Kay McIff [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-25 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON |
2013-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SCON |
2013-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SCON |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SCON |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSTNAE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTNAE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTNAE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-03-04 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-03-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0277 (Replaces) 2013-03-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB