UT SB0272 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital City Revitalization Zone
Title
Capital City Revitalization Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-12 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Local Taxation and Fees
Planning and Zoning
Public Infrastructure District
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Local Taxation and Fees
Planning and Zoning
Public Infrastructure District
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax