UT SB0271S03 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0271

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School Grading Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Grading Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-25 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-25SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2013-03-19 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-14 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-14 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ uncircled in SCURCAL
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ circled in SCURCAL
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-14SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ substituted in H3RDSB
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ uncircled in H3RDSB
2013-03-13HouseSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDSB
2013-03-13HouseLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDSB
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ circled in H3RDSB
2013-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2013-03-12HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-03-11HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-11HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2013-03-11HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2013-03-11SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2013-03-11SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2013-03-11SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2013-03-11SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2013-03-06SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2013-03-06SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU
2013-03-06SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU
2013-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU
2013-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-03-01 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-03-01 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0271 (Replaces) 2013-03-14 - House/ substituted in HSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0271S03.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0271s03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillenr/sb0271.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2013GS&voteid=2767&sequence=26985
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1374&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1375&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1376&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1014&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1170&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1171&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1172&house=H&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1699&house=S&sessionid=2013GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1730&house=S&sessionid=2013GS

Bill Comments

feedback