UT SB0250 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendment to the Uniform Debt Management Services Act
Title
Amendment to the Uniform Debt Management Services Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0250.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/sbillint/sb0250.pdf |