UT SB0245 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mule Deer Protection Act
Title
Mule Deer Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-28 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0245.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/sbillint/sb0245.pdf |