UT SB0239 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act
Title
Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Development
Insurance
Revenue and Taxation
Tax Credits
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Development
Insurance
Revenue and Taxation
Tax Credits